+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (13)
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Appropriations