+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Finance
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Judiciary
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor + Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 2015: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1056 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 9-2.
February 5, 2015: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1056 to the Committee on Finance. The motion passed on a vote of 12-1.
January 29, 2015: House Business Affairs and Labor: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment L). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor