+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 6/1/2016 - No Amendments
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/24/2016 - No Amendments
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary