+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Appropriations