+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services