+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
+ − Votes (2)
February 18, 2016: Senate Finance: . .HB16-1049
January 20, 2016: House Finance: . .HB16-1049
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor