+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor