+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1046 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 7-6.
February 4, 2015: House Transportation & Energy: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment F). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor