+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 11, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 12, 2013: House Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development: FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.001 (Attachment C). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor