+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
- Sent to the Governor
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Finance
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 4, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary