+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
April 24, 2013: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - COW, Consent Calendar The motion passed on a vote of 7-0.
April 1, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - COW - amended The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor