+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance