+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government