+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 2013: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - COW and to consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 5-0.
February 20, 2013: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1035 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 5-0.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor