+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 9, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Finance
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to Finance
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 18, 2014: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1034 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 5-0.
March 12, 2014: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1034 to the Committee on Finance. The motion passed on a vote of 7-0.
February 21, 2014: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1034, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor