+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 01/30/2017 - No Amendments
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor