+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 24, 2015: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1034 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 5-0.
January 30, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1034, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor