+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary