+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Appropriations
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 24, 2015: Senate Appropriations: . .HB15-1030
April 22, 2015: Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .HB15-1030
April 10, 2015: House Appropriations: . .HB15-1030
April 10, 2015: House Appropriations: . .HB15-1030
January 26, 2015: House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .HB15-1030
January 26, 2015: House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .HB15-1030
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor