+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 7, 2020 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
- Sent to the Governor
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On June 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On June 5, 2020 in the House:
- First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor