+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government