+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Appropriations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor