+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 22, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection.
April 22, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor