+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Finance
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Finance
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Transportation & Energy
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Transportation & Energy
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
April 17, 2015: Senate Appropriations: . .HB15-1026
March 24, 2015: Senate Finance: . .HB15-1026
March 24, 2015: Senate Finance: . .HB15-1026
March 18, 2015: Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .HB15-1026
March 6, 2015: House Appropriations: . .HB15-1026
March 6, 2015: House Appropriations: . .HB15-1026
February 25, 2015: House Finance: . .HB15-1026
February 18, 2015: House Transportation & Energy: . .HB15-1026
February 11, 2015: House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .HB15-1026
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor