+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
- Sent to the Governor
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over to 01/30/2018 - No Amendments
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor