+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 18, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government