+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary