+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services + Appropriations
+ − Votes (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor