+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
April 24, 2013: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.006 (Attachment A). The motion passed without objection.
April 24, 2013: Senate Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1020, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 4-1.
April 12, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1020, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
February 7, 2013: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Amend L.003 to replace all instances of "sixty" with "ninety". The motion passed without objection.
February 7, 2013: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Amend L.003, page 3, line 12, strike "ninety" and substitute "one hundred twenty". The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor