+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 29, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/26/2018 - No Amendments
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor