+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Public Health Care & Human Services
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Public Health Care & Human Services
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (12)
April 10, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1018, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 7-6.
April 10, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection.
February 20, 2015: House Public Health Care & Human Services: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1018, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 9-4.
February 20, 2015: House Public Health Care & Human Services: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment C). The motion passed without objection.
February 20, 2015: House Public Health Care & Human Services: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment B). The motion passed without objection.
February 3, 2015: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E). The motion passed without objection.
February 3, 2015: House Judiciary: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor