+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary