+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Finance
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Finance