+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/05/2018 - No Amendments
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor