+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services