+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy + Appropriations
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/10/2015 - No Amendments
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Appropriations