+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Lay on the Table-Deemed Lost
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Lay Over Amended
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Appropriations