+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
April 4, 2014: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed on a vote of 8-5.
April 4, 2014: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor