+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Transportation & Energy
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Transportation & Energy + Appropriations
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 6, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1012, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
January 28, 2015: House Transportation & Energy: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1012 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
January 28, 2015: House Transportation & Energy: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1012 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion failed on a vote of 6-7.
January 21, 2015: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor