+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations