+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 03/06/2017
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/01/2017 - No Amendments
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor