+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Appropriations
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 26, 2013: Senate Transportation: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1011 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 5-0.
February 8, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection The motion passed without objection. The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor