+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 17, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Referred w/Amend. to Appropriations - Committee
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development