+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
+ − Votes (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor