+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 7, 2013: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment A). The motion passed without objection.
February 1, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - COW - unamended The motion passed on a vote of 11-0.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor