+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy