+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2020 - No Amendments
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/13/2020 - No Amendments
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Health & Insurance Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor