+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance