+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Action - Signed
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Legislative Council Re-Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Legislative Council
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 1, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer to Legislative Council The motion passed on a vote of 8-5.
April 1, 2013: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - resconsideration - final vote The motion passed on a vote of 8-5.
February 25, 2013: House Education: FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1007, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 7-5, with one member excused.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor