+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 01/26/2017 - No Amendments
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor